DEVIZES LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Activities: We operate in the Devizes area, raising money from the public by organising fund raising events where we collect money in a variety of ways. Most of this income is dispersed to local charities, needy people and good causes, carefully vetted by our Welfare Committee. A small proportion goes to Lions National and International for humanitarian and relief projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 24 October 2019: CIO registration
- 16 December 2020: Funds received from 1026909 LIONS CLUB OF DEVIZES CHARITY ACCOUNT
- DEVIZES LIONS (Working name)
- DEVIZES LIONS CLUB (Working name)
- LIONS CLUB OF DEVIZES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Jayne Wilson | Chair | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE MICHELLE SHEPPARD | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Cooper | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ellis | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donald Jones | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lance Sheppard | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wilson | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY ANDREW KING | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £30.68k | £30.68k | £34.76k | £34.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £31.55k | £31.55k | £36.01k | £36.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 September 2024 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ENGLAND AND WALES, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR: THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP BY; PROMOTING THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP; ENCOURAGING MEMBERS TO TAKE AN ACTIVE INTEREST IN THE CIVIC, CULTURAL, SOCIAL AND MORAL WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITY; PROVIDING A FORUM FOR THE OPEN DISCUSSION OF ALL MATTERS OF PUBLIC INTEREST; PROVIDED THAT PARTISAN POLITICS AND SECTARIAN RELIGION SHALL NOT BE DEBATED BY MEMBERS; ENCOURAGING SERVICE-MINDED PEOPLE TO SERVE THEIR COMMUNITY WITHOUT PERSONAL REWARD AND ENCOURAGING THE PROMOTION OF HIGH ETHICAL STANDARDS IN COMMERCE, INDUSTRY, PROFESSIONS, PUBLIC WORKS AND PRIVATE ENDEAVOURS; SUPPORTING YOUTH TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; PROMOTING THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PEOPLE IN LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES; PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING; THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN AID AND DISASTER RELIEF; THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES BY PREVENTING AVOIDABLE BLINDNESS, ASSISTING DISABLED PEOPLE TO LEAD INDEPENDENT LIVES OR HELPING TO PREVENT OR MANAGE HEALH ISSUES; PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND/OR PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NURSTEED COMMUNITY CENTRE
NURSTEED ROAD
DEVIZES
SN10 3AF
- Phone:
- 03458336749
- Email:
- admin@devizeslions.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window