THE PINES PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the association is to advance the education of pupils in the school by developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school. Our aim is to raise funds from events to provide facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 03 February 2020: Standard registration
- PPFA (Working name)
- THE PINES PFA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LUCIA NIOLA | Chair | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
DENISE CURTIS | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Emma Nickerson | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £418 | £1.74k | £7.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153 | £283 | £1.44k | £5.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 21 February 2025 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PINES PRIMARY SCHOOL
MANOR WOOD
RED LODGE
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP28 8WL
- Phone:
- 01638790135
- Email:
- pfa@pinesprimary.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window