Accounts and annual returns WALSALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1189701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 28 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 28 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 06 August 2024 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 06 August 2024 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 21 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 21 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 18 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window