FAST LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FAST youth workers look to provide strong positive role models, highly effective prevention and intervention youth work, diversionary and inspiring activities to help hard to reach young people in South London to complete their education, healthy relationships and develop a pathway for an aspirational future. Activities that we do include mentoring, sports and field trips.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £33,831 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 May 2020: CIO registration
- FAST PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Langton | Chair | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joel Robinson | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Li | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Alebioshu | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.78k | £49.90k | £199.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.85k | £86.16k | £169.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.23k | £6.22k | £33.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYÆS OBJECTS (ÔOBJECTS) ARE UNDERTAKEN WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- 1) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yvonne Carr Centre
2 Thessaly Road
London
SW8 4HT
- Phone:
- 07528065764
- Email:
- info@fastlondon.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window