WERRINGTON COMMUNITY LIBRARY & WELLBEING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We manage the local library and supply facilities and services that help the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 18 November 2019: CIO registration
- WERRINGTON COMMUNITY VOLUNTEERS GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Warren Jason Cartlidge | Chair | 01 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Jean Fryer | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eveline Betty Johnson | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Donna Ruscoe | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.08k | £9.89k | £11.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.08k | £6.18k | £11.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.16k | £6.26k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 04 December 2024 | 279 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 04 December 2024 | 279 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF WERRINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY LIBRARY SERVICE. (2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS IN WERRINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (3) THE PROMOTION OF VOLUNTEERING BY PROVIDING VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN WERRINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND OFFERING SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS AND CAPABILITIES IN VOLUNTEERING. (4) TO ADVANCE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE WITHIN THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE: • CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. • VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Werrington Library
Ash Bank Road
Werrington
Stoke on Trent
Staffordshire
ST9 0JS
- Phone:
- 01782302706
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window