DOLGELLAU INSTITUTE (KNOWN LOCALLY AS THE FREE LIBRARY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of an institute for the inhabitants of Dolgellau and the neighbourhood thereof, without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for meetings, lectures and classes and other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the condition of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £27,715 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 20 January 1984: Standard registration
- THE FREE LIBRARY DOLGELLAU (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Jones | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Sion Edwards | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nia Smith | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
BRANWEN RHYS DAFYDD | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|||||
YWAIN MYFYR | Trustee | 02 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
BOB GUNTON | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Jo Checkley | Trustee | 27 May 2014 |
|
|||||
JOHN CADWALADR | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
DYFRIG SIENCYN SIENCYN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN RAGHOOBAR | Trustee |
|
||||||
HEILYN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.01k | £60.94k | £108.19k | £27.47k | £32.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.19k | £63.37k | £150.08k | £22.11k | £15.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £38.00k | £47.00k | £107.99k | £25.00k | £27.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14 NOVEMBER 1983 AS AFFECTED BY S16 ORDER DATED 29 JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN INSTITUTE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF DOLGELLAU AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETING, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHBITANTS.
Area of benefit
DOLGELLAU AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 NANT Y GADER
DOLGELLAU
LL40 1LB
- Phone:
- 01341421071
- Email:
- rhys.r.williams@talk21.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window