LEON'S LEGACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We fundraise for defibrillators for schools as well as offering CPR training to these schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Holly Younger | Chair | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
david mortimer | Trustee | 14 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Overfield | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Smith | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jaime Smith | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/02/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.49k | £14.87k | £19.41k | £10.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.99k | £9.35k | £18.04k | £16.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 182 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 February 2021 | 04 January 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 February 2021 | 04 January 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND SAVE LIVES BY: A) PROVIDING SCHOOLS WITH AED DEFIBRILLATORS AND SUPPORTING THEIR ONGOING CARE AND MAINTENANCE. B) WORKING WITH SCHOOLS TO SUPPORT MEASURES TO ENABLE THEIR AED DEFIBRILLATORS TO BE MADE AVAILABLE FOR WIDER COMMUNITY ACCESS AND USE. C) PROVIDING SCHOOL STAFF AND PUPILS WITH ACCESS TO EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN MATTERS RELATING TO CARDIAC ARREST, BASIC LIFE SAVING FIRST AID AND HOW TO PERFORM CPR AND ADMINISTER AED DEFIBRILLATORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 ADAMS PARK WAY
KIRKBY-IN-ASHFIELD
NOTTINGHAM
NG17 8SS
- Phone:
- 07793716132
- Email:
- leonslegacy@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window