HOME-START SHEFFIELD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Sheffield City
Governance
- SHEFFIELD HOME START (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £199.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 02 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 APRIL 1984 AS AMENDED 18 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF SHEFFIELD AND ITS ENVIRONS (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD AND ITS ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window