THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY SPIRIT, SOUTHSEA, DIOCESE OF PORTSMOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation provides church facilities/ rooms for hire, place of worship, generally advancing religion, pastoral care and outreach for the parish. The church is also available to the public for private prayer and reflection. Facilities are open every day for more information on opening times please refer to our website https://www.holyspiritsouthsea.org.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 11 September 2019: Standard registration
- HOLY SPIRIT PCC, SOUTHSEA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Russell Lawson | Chair | 13 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marilynne Piotrowicz | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Nicholls | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Condley | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sue Chatband | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Etherington | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Hazel Fuller | Trustee | 04 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eve Benford | Trustee | 04 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Kanavan | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Fenton | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Pearson | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Bridgman | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP DREW BA, ARCO | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Sean Kanavan | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.43k | £126.40k | £93.71k | £125.79k | £143.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.75k | £56.52k | £118.22k | £74.43k | £70.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLY SPIRIT CHURCH
HEYWARD ROAD
SOUTHSEA
PO4 0DY
- Phone:
- 02392296364
- Email:
- HSPCCsec@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window