THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD VINE CONNECTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Harrow
Governance
- 19 August 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Director Mrs Florence Ogunyinka | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Olumuyiwa Ayeni | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rita Okoroba | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/07/2020 | 15/07/2021 | 15/07/2022 | 15/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.34k | £8.47k | £7.28k | £4.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.95k | £7.07k | £8.57k | £19.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 July 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 July 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 July 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 July 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3a Parkfield Drive
NORTHOLT
UB5 5NR
- Phone:
- 02035561155
- Email:
- rccgtvc@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window