THAMES REACH HOUSING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Thames Reach Housing works with homeless and vulnerable adults through the provision and management of housing including social housing. Thames Reach Housing is in the process of applying to become a registered provider of social housing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 March 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Robert Fisher | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Susan Ramsden | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Laister Malcolm | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Olukemi Olasunbo Jeboda | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||
VASIM UL HAQ | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 JUL 2018 as amended on 20 Jun 2022 as amended on 20 Jun 2022 as amended on 20 Jun 2022 as amended on 20 Jun 2022 as amended on 20 Jun 2022 as amended on 20 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE "OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, OLD AGE, DISABILITY OR ILL HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF HOUSING INCLUDING SOCIAL HOUSING; AND ANY OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thames Reach
The Employment Academy
29 Peckham Road
London
SE5 8UA
- Phone:
- 02036176070
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window