TRUE LIGHT CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prevention or relief of poverty We focus on financial hardship, self-development, managing money, getting out of debt, we provide assistant with food, clothing, bedding, furniture for the public Advancement of religion We provided facilities for worship and Christian education We do missionary outreach in communities We provided counseling, visiting the sick and the dying
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Jamaica
Governance
- 13 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENNIS PHILLIPS | Chair | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNANETTA FULLER | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHEENA JOHNSON | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00k | £2.45k | £1.48k | £630 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.16k | £495 | £716 | £250 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WHO MAY HAVE FOUND THEMSELVES IN POVERTY AND WILL BE SUPPORTED IN THE AREAS OF ASSISTANCE, EDUCATION, SOCIAL EXCLUSION AND ANY OTHER POSSIBLE AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
154 Manor Road
Mitcham
CR4 1JF
- Phone:
- 07307849674
- Email:
- truelightchurch1@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window