SIMON KING ALTERNATIVE PERFORMING ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance and promote for the public benefit the performing arts generally and in particular but not exclusively, music, dance, speech and drama,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 July 2020: CIO registration
- SKAPA (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Baker | Chair | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Broadbent | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaime Rory Lucy | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Thorpe | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Howard Jacobs | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Semay Wu | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEAN TRACY BRODRICK MA | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Plummer | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Hayes | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.86k | £245 | £602 | £20 | |
|
Total expenditure | £549 | £584 | £516 | £406 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PERFORMING ARTS GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MUSIC, DANCE, SPEECH AND DRAMA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
127 EGLINTON ROAD
LONDON
SE18 3SJ
- Phone:
- 02083166943
- Email:
- info@skapa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window