DISABILITY NORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE INCLUSION INDEPENDENCE AND CHOICE FOR DISABLED PEOPLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£646,118
Donations and legacies | £16.94k | |
Charitable activities | £564.08k | |
Other trading activities | £56.99k | |
Investments | £5.11k | |
Other | £3.00k |
Total expenditure:
£612,268
Raising funds | £3.93k | |
Charitable activities | £608.34k | |
Other | £0 |
£208 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £207,334 from 1 government contract(s) and £31,795 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.93k | |
Charitable expenditure | £608.34k | |
Retained for future use | £33.85k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.93k | |
Charitable expenditure | £608.34k | |
Retained for future use | £34.06k |
People

20 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of York
- Cumbria
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- North Yorkshire
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 24 January 1984: Standard registration
- NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE COUNCIL FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Reynolds | Chair | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Sinclair Mr | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Morris | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Beth Rowlands | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Hunter | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James Neal | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £510.67k | £500.43k | £529.35k | £452.03k | £646.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £496.32k | £477.81k | £485.86k | £525.98k | £612.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.39k | £207.33k | |
|
Income from government grants | £194.42k | £15.84k | £20.00k | £6.00k | £31.80k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £120.58k | £299.31k | £230.22k | N/A | £16.94k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £74.82k | £41.03k | £50.43k | N/A | £56.99k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £312.02k | £156.86k | £245.33k | N/A | £564.08k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £523 | £944 | £431 | N/A | £5.11k | |
|
Income - Other | £2.72k | £2.29k | £2.93k | N/A | £3.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £496.32k | £454.75k | £464.06k | N/A | £608.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £650 | £0 | N/A | £3.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £5.00k | £2.50k | N/A | £2.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £22.41k | £21.80k | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £211.64k | £205.34k | £193.17k | N/A | £174.63k | |
|
Long-term investments | £28.84k | £28.92k | £27.63k | N/A | £25.86k | |
|
Other assets | £261.07k | £285.07k | £292.24k | N/A | £645.65k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | -£382.22k | -£350.26k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £425.69k | £38.55k | £22.02k | N/A | £118.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 DECEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 9 MAY 1994, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12 JANUARY 1999 AND 21 SEPTEMBER 2004 as amended on 20 May 2019
Charitable objects
The objects for which Disability North is established are: i. To promote the relief of disabled people and in particular their integration into society, operating within the North of England. ii. To provide disabled people with the support they require by addressing the disadvantage or restriction of activity caused by social attitudes and environmental barriers (in the Articles the words ?disabled people? include people who have a physical, sensory or mental impairment). iii. To promote and support research and survey in social welfare issues related to disabled people and to publish the results of such research.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Disability North
The Dene Centre
Castle Farm Road
Gosforth
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE3 1PH
- Phone:
- 01912840480
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window