ASK FOR CLIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASK FOR CLIVE WORKS WITH VENUES AND ORGANISATIONS TO PROMOTE LGBT+ INCLUSION AND PROVIDE WELCOME SPACES AND ENSURE ZERO TOLERANCE TOWARDS LGBT+ DISCRIMINATION AND HATE, WITH ANY INSTANCE COUNTERED AND REPORTED APPROPRIATELY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Clare | Chair | 13 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Robinson | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Silvana Kill | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Frederick Watson | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Speak | Trustee | 13 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clive Duffey | Trustee | 13 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Teri Niadna | Trustee | 13 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.26k | £1.67k | £6.09k | £20.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.14k | £6.64k | £8.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG THE LGBTQ+ COMMUNITY BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION, GENDER IDENTITY OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT. 2) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION, GENDER IDENTITY OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; AND (D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
224A LONDON ROAD
ST. ALBANS
AL1 1JQ
- Phone:
- 07414585888
- Email:
- askforclive@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window