NIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working for the betterment of the poor and needy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 13 January 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohamed Yoosuf Lebbe Noordeen | Chair | 17 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED NAMEES SEYED IBRAHIM | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Imran Mohamed Kamal Mr | Trustee | 17 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Uzair Mohamed Omerdeen | Trustee | 17 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Irshad Mohamed Jamaldeen | Trustee | 17 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Shafraz Fareegul Nizam | Trustee | 17 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.56k | £246.59k | £395.80k | £139.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.24k | £253.89k | £393.37k | £129.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED ON 13 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN HARROW AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO ARE HOMELESS, BY THE PROVISION OF ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN SRI LANKA BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Brook Drive
HARROW
Middlesex
HA1 4RS
- Phone:
- 07368342379
- Email:
- info@nidaservices.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window