Financial history THE RIVERSIDE PLAYERS

Charity number: 514741
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2011 31/05/2012 31/05/2013 31/05/2014 31/05/2015
Total gross income £23.78k £24.29k £22.60k £18.02k £10.38k
Total expenditure £24.03k £23.05k £23.27k £22.44k £9.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0