TINY PAWS MCR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tiny Paws MCR is a small animal rescue located in Manchester. We take in domestic rodents and rabbits who are in need of new homes, rehabilitate them and arrange any required veterinary treatment, before rehoming them to carefully checked suitable adopters. We also provide sanctuary for animals who are unable to be rehomed due to health issues and those who require palliative care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Wright | Chair | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola O'Brien | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Herbert | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.43k | £15.36k | £27.69k | £35.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.61k | £14.96k | £22.16k | £29.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOMESTIC SPECIES OF RODENTS AND RABBITS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Laburnum Dr (Private residence)
BURY
Lancashire
BL9 8NB
- Phone:
- 07846344772
- Email:
- tinypawsmcr@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window