EXODUS YOUTH WORX UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Exodus YouthWorx UK is a diverse youth community which aspires to empower young people by providing services that support and encourage emotional, physical, mental, social and spiritual growth. Exodus YouthWorx UK is open to all youth up to the age of 30. We are now looking for funding to be able to bring Exodus YouthWorx UK to life and launch into one of the most deprived areas in London, Enfield
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £6,274 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Archbishop Anba Angaelos | Chair | 28 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marina Ayad Fidal | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Habib | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Rosalie Armanious | Trustee | 28 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Manal El-Maraghy | Trustee | 28 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.09k | £15.85k | £119.93k | £107.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.59k | £15.96k | £90.92k | £96.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.70k | £20.26k | £6.27k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 January 2025 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 January 2025 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: A)PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES, ASSIST WITH THEIR EMOTIONAL, PHYSICAL, MENTAL, SPIRITUAL AND/OR SOCIAL GROWTH AND ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. B)ADVANCING EDUCATION AND PROMOTING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING AND TRAINING. C)ACTING AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF IMPROVING THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Sanctuary
St. Andrew by The Wardrobe
St. Andrew's Hill
London
EC4V 5DE
- Phone:
- 02079936126
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window