THE COMMUNITY CUPBOARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A registered charity providing food and and grocery support to residents in the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £10,668 from 6 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 16 September 2019: CIO registration
- 17 January 2023: Funds received from 1064868 KING'S CHURCH (WEST KINGSDOWN) CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Gower | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Wenn Mr | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Veronica McGannon | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amy Jane Eley | Trustee | 16 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.43k | £64.69k | £107.60k | £133.55k | £103.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.84k | £23.14k | £67.26k | £106.02k | £133.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £5.00k | £26.42k | £7.11k | £10.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE PERSONS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN NEW ASH GREEN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA,THAT ARE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD SUPPLIES, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS BOTH TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND ALSO TO OTHER CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY. B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT ADVISORY SERVICES OR INFORMATION.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Community Cupboard
Gamecock Meadow
London Road
West Kingsdown
SEVENOAKS
Kent
- Phone:
- 07526 823122
- Website:
-
thecommunitycupboard.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window