HIJAZ WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hijaz Welfare Trust aims to help the poor & needy with dedicated programmes, such as water wells, orphans sponsorship, providing nutritious food, emergency aid in response to crisis, providing healthcare projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Pakistan
Governance
- 22 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KHAMEEDA BEGUM | Trustee | 30 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
RASHID ZABEER HUSSAIN | Trustee | 06 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
ABRAR UBAID HUSSAIN | Trustee | 06 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.72k | £9.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.43k | £8.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 May 2023 | 477 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 May 2023 | 477 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
26 March 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, ORPHANS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, WATER AND CLOTHING, COSTS FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT AND COSTS FOR ATTENDING SCHOOL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS AND TRAINING CENTRES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SAID PERSONS; (3) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM VIA THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAN AND SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE AND BLESSINGS BE UPON HIM) AS INTERPRETED BY THE AHLE SUNNAH WAL JAMAAH SCHOOL OF THOUGHT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1a Harnall Lane East
COVENTRY
CV1 5ae
- Phone:
- 07825030030
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window