PEAT'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity owns property and collects rental income to provide grants to young people under the age of 25 for their personal educational and development
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
Governance
- 31 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY JOHN MARKHAM | Chair | 13 November 2001 |
|
|||||
Andrew Angus White | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|||||
James Thomas Barker | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev SHEILA MORTON | Trustee | 10 June 2008 |
|
|||||
THOMAS EDWARD WOOTTON | Trustee | 04 June 2003 |
|
|||||
ROBERT JEFFERIES HARRISON | Trustee | 24 May 1990 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.00k | £109.00k | £32.23k | £79.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.59k | £30.00k | £13.20k | £38.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 December 2023 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 December 2023 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 November 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 November 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE WILDEN CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TOWARDS THE COSTS OF MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE SCHOOL. 2. PROMOTING EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN THE PARISH OF WILDEN. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT SCHOOLS SERVING THE PARISH OF WILDEN BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOLS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TIMMS SQUARE
CHURCH FARM LANE
WILDEN
BEDFORD
MK44 2PF
- Phone:
- 01234771117
- Email:
- annemarkham@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window