PEVENSEY CHURCH FARM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pevensey Church Farm Trust owns Church Farm field, Pevensey, which is adjacent to the churchyard of St Nicolas Pevensey. The Trust was created to provide an extension of the graveyard in part of its field, which requires approval from the county archaeologist and church authorities, and the raising of funds for an archaeological survey. The field is currently let to a tenant for grazing of animals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 27 May 2020: CIO registration
- 03 November 2021: Funds received from 1057769 PEVENSEY CHURCH FARM TRUST
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON DAVID HAIGH SARGENT | Chair | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER LOWTON | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £520 | £562 | £576 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £376 | £390 | £391 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THEIR OWNERSHIP OF PEVENSEY CHURCH FARM FIELD FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE EXTENSION OF THE CHURCHYARD AT PEVENSEY CHURCH AND BY MAINTAINING IT AS A TRANQUIL AND ATTRACTIVE AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARSH HALL
CHURCH LANE
PEVENSEY
BN24 5LD
- Phone:
- 01323743301
- Email:
- simonsargent@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window