EASTLEIGH FOOTBALL CLUB COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for the playing of association football and other sports capable of improving health (facilities means: land, buildings, equipment and activities)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £26,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 02 December 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Hill | Trustee | 21 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Mark Reid | Trustee | 21 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hayton Cowap | Trustee | 27 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Coffey | Trustee | 27 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.81k | £23.25k | £76.94k | £52.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.89k | £24.18k | £92.52k | £73.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £26.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2023
(These accounts |
20 November 2024 | 173 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 March 2024 | 280 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 March 2024 | 295 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF EASTLEIGH AND HAMPSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS: 3.1.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH (FACILITIES IN THIS ARTICLE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.1.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3.1.3 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROMOTE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; 3.1.4 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND OTHER PERSONS (INCLUDING ACADEMIC, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) THROUGH SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; AND 3.1.5 FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN EACH CASE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EASTLEIGH FOOTBALL CLUB
STONEHAM LANE
EASTLEIGH
SO50 9HT
- Phone:
- 02380613361
- Email:
- admin@eastleighfc.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window