LOVE MILL ROAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Love Mill Road is a charity which nurtures and celebrates the Mill Road community, ensuring it continues to be a special place that is welcoming to all and where the most vulnerable in the community are offered the support they need. We provide grants to support charitable work, with a focus on tackling inequality, enhancing the Mill Road environment and celebrating local arts and culture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 15 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katharine Frances Collins | Chair | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ruth Barry | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Katharine Rachel Hawks | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda May Palfreyman | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Pyne | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Susan Rachel Biller | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dadhi Ram Chudali | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.93k | £2.38k | £5.26k | £10.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.09k | £1.10k | £4.00k | £6.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 10 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 10 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 19 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 19 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, TO BE UNDERTAKEN IN THE ROMSEY AND PETERSFIELD WARDS OF CAMBRIDGE, ARE THE FOLLOWING: TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 St. Barnabas Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 2BY
- Phone:
- 07813 096123
- Email:
- katecollins32stb@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window