FUTURE ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Future Academy provides humanitarian support, education, sport and enrichment activities for conflict-affected children in Beirut. Our goals are to improve access to higher education and employment; build the strong emotional foundations needed to thrive and be mentally healthy; and to provide opportunities for friendship and fun.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lebanon
Governance
- 04 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Martin Watts | Chair | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Antonia Isobel Elliott | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Nicola Watts | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
James William Watts | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Damien Andrew Gabet | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.90k | £21.86k | £41.21k | £43.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.36k | £20.78k | £33.02k | £41.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Feb 2020 as amended on 27 Aug 2021 as amended on 27 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are for the public benefit to advance in life and relieve the needs of refugee, stateless and internally-displaced young people up to the age of 18 living in Lebanon by: A) Developing their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as independent, mature and responsible individuals; B) Advancing education; C) Providing recreational and leisure time activity in the interests of social welfare for people living in the area of benefit who have need by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disability, poverty or social and economic circumstances with a view to improving the conditions of life for such persons.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brierley
First Avenue
FRINTON-ON-SEA
CO13 9EX
- Phone:
- 01255569899
- Email:
- contact@future-academy.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window