Financial history BRANDLESHOLME COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 1185219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £50.09k £20.21k £39.94k £32.27k £9.58k
Total expenditure £16.96k £19.79k £27.83k £22.47k £28.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.00k N/A £14.65k £4.60k £1.00k