SAHRUDAYA THE KENT KERALITES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekend language classes (Malayalam), Chenda (cylindrical percussion instrument ) classes, Supporting Sahrudaya Royals Cricket Club, other Sports and Arts Day events. Planned Social and Traditional Cultural events etc.,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 21 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Viju Varghese | Chair | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mebin Baby | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shibi Rajan | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sujith Murali | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bibin Abraham | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Vijil John Pothen | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Linda Parambath | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Albert George | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rohith Varma Ravivarma Krishnakumari | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shino T Paul | Trustee | 28 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Niyas Moothedath Purakkal | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.01k | £1.28k | £2.07k | £726 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.95k | £1.08k | £900 | £600 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 31 July 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF KERALA AND INDIA IN GENERAL, INCLUDING MALAYALAM LITERATURE, MUSIC AND PERFORMING ARTS. TO ENCOURAGE AN APPRECIATION OF AND AN UNDERSTANDING OF CULTURAL DIFFERENCES IN THE UK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Ridgeway
Pembury
Tunbridge Wells
Kent
TN2 4ER
- Phone:
- 07956184796
- Email:
- office@sahrudaya.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window