GIRLS FLOW FREE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Girls Flow Free provides menstrual health and hygiene education and free menstrual products to girls and women in Ghana and Milton Keynes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Milton Keynes
- Ghana
Governance
- 24 January 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophia Adwoa Acheampong | Chair | 22 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vida Gyamfi | Trustee | 22 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adell Ama Koranteng | Trustee | 22 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.01k | £9.18k | £10.66k | £1.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.44k | £9.03k | £9.18k | £4.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.54k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jan 2020 as amended on 12 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF WOMEN AND GIRLS, LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND GHANA, BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH SANITARY ITEMS AND RELATED PRODUCTS WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, AND PARTICULAR PEOPLE LIVING IN GHANA, ON SEXUAL REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH AND MENSTRUATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Cluny Court
Wavendon Gate
MILTON KEYNES
MK7 7TT
- Phone:
- 07359204142
- Email:
- Girlsflowfree@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window