REASONABLE ACCESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing information and resources to empower people in: Challenging disability access problems. Pushing back against access refusals. Making informal complaints about access failings. Dealing with poor responses to access problems and complaints. Escalating complaints to more formal and serious modes. Taking legal cases with and without lawyer representation and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Esther Oak Loukin | Chair | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Jack Paulley | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
NATALYA DELL | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/02/2021 | 01/02/2022 | 01/02/2023 | 01/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £611 | £94 | £44 | £7.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2 | £0 | £5 | £308 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 February 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 February 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 February 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 February 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
OBJECTS TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF DISABILITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY; A) RAISING AWARENESS OF ALL ASPECTS OF DISCRIMINATION IN SOCIETY BY PUBLICATIONS, LECTURES, USE OF THE MEDIA, PUBLIC ADVOCACY AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION; B) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF THE SAME TO THE PUBLIC; C) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WHETHER BY TEACHING OR PRODUCING MATERIALS; D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY THE USE OF PUBLICATIONS, THE MEDIA AND PUBLIC ADVOCACY; E) PROMOTING THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW RELATING TO EQUALITY ISSUES BY; I) THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST LEGAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION TO PEOPLE WHO ARE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH LEGAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION AS A RESULT OF THEIR LACK OF RESOURCE; II) THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST LEGAL INTERVENTION TO ASSIST THE COURTS; AND III) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE ON THE INSTITUTIONS, STRUCTURES AND MECHANISMS BY WHICH SUCH LAW IS ENFORCED. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY DISABLED PEOPLE) ON THE SUBJECT OF DISABILITY ACCESS RIGHTS NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Reasonable Access
C/O Inclusion London
336 Brixton Road
LONDON
SW9 7AA
- Phone:
- 02037734279
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window