THE UNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A parent-led group providing accessible events for families living with disability, neurodiversity or from vulnerable backgrounds; friendship and support for parents/carers and siblings; inclusion training for businesses and schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 06 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Sarah Symmonds | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Walker | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Patricia Gardner | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.50k | £3.34k | £881 | |
|
Total expenditure | £50 | £215 | £1.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 May 2024 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WHO ARE NEUROLOGICALLY DIVERSE OR DISABLED OR SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED TO HELP THEM DEVELOP, THRIVE AND REACH THE BEST OF THEIR INDIVIDUAL POTENTIAL AND ENCOURAGING THEM TO ADAPT IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY BY:- - THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH SOCIAL INCLUSION AND DEVELOPMENT ACTIVITIES TO IMPROVE THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES; - THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMMES FOR THE FAMILIES, CARERS AND PROFESSIONALS WHO HAVE A ROLE IN SUPPORTING THE INDIVIDUALS WITH DISABILITIES; - THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH TRAINING FOR BUSINESSES AND SERVICE PROVIDERS TO HELP THEM MAKE REASONABLE ADJUSTMENTS TO MEET NEED AND IMPROVE ACCESSIBILITY AND INCLUSION - THE DEVELOPMENT OF NEW SERVICES TO SUPPORT THE WELLBEING OF FAMILIES, WORKING WITH PEOPLE ON THE AUTISM SPECTRUM AND CHILDREN WITH OTHER ADDITIONAL NEEDS, INCLUDING PHYSICAL, BEHAVIOURAL AND EMOTIONAL; - THE PROVISION OF ACCESSIBLE EVENTS AND FUN DAYS FOR THE WHOLE FAMILY; AND - THE PROVISION OF PARENT AND SIBLING SUPPORT, INCLUDING A BEFRIENDING / MENTORING SERVICE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Royal Crescent
HARROGATE
HG2 8AB
- Phone:
- 07791790205
- Email:
- info@theunity.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window