MUSIC MATTERS IN OSWESTRY AND THE BORDERLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to increase opportunity and access to learning music. MusicMOB will fund music lessons (singing and instrumental) for young people attending state schools in Oswestry and its surrounding villages. We also will loan instruments and provide tuition books and music stands
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £1,450 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Powys
- Shropshire
- Wrexham
Governance
- 31 March 2020: CIO registration
- 19 October 2023: Funds received from 1108944 OSWESTRY MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY
- MUSICMOB (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Coppock | Chair | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phillip James Springett | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Stocker | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Tasker | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr MILES PAUL MYRES | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.60k | £28.59k | £23.69k | £28.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £784 | £9.37k | £19.87k | £20.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.50k | £4.00k | £1.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 LIVING IN OSWESTRY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN FULL TIME STATE-FUNDED EDUCATION, OR BEING HOME EDUCATED, BY PROVIDING FUNDING FOR INSTRUMENTAL, SINGING AND MUSIC THEORY TEACHING AND ENABLING ACCESS TO MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS AND PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES WITH THE AIM OF ENHANCING THE KNOWLEDGE, EXPERIENCE, ENJOYMENT, UNDERSTANDING AND PERFORMANCE OF MUSIC.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clemhill Cottage
New Marton
St. Martins
OSWESTRY
Shropshire
SY11 3HR
- Phone:
- 01691 690314
- Email:
- paulmyres@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window