HARDWAY ELSON & DISTRICTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities include: Providing rooms for the Hampshire Council sponsored Pre-School Group, along with assisting local Charity Groups and providing a safe & welcoming space for use by our local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 09 April 2020: CIO registration
- 06 December 2022: Funds received from 301834 HARDWAY ELSON AND DISTRICTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATIONS
- HEDCA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ronald Ian Jeffery | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Wagstaff | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Jeffery | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.74k | £73.25k | £126.47k | £162.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.50k | £77.99k | £159.44k | £197.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | £19.14k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO: (A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HARDWAY, ELSON AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT, OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE ("THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; AND (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEDCA
COOMBE ROAD
GOSPORT
PO12 4JB
- Phone:
- 02392588023
- Email:
- hedca23@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
hedca.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window