WOODLARKS - EMPOWERING THE LESS ABLED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs and to promote the good health of people who have a physical and, or learning disability, in particular by supporting the work of The Woodlarks Centre (14438R) is such ways as the trustees may from time to time think fit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Surrey
Governance
- 12 December 2019: CIO registration
- WELA (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Anthony Archer-Burton | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Warnock | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Vasey | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP WILLIAM GERMAN | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2024 | 324 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS AND TO PROMOTE THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE A PHYSICAL AND, OR LEARNING DISABILITY, IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE WOODLARKS CENTRE (14438R) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOODLARKS
LODGE HILL ROAD
LOWER BOURNE
FARNHAM
GU10 3RB
- Phone:
- 01252714041
- Email:
- admin@thewoodlarkscentre.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window