Trustees THE GLASS SOCIETY
Charity number: 1185397

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Simon Cottle | Chair | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Page | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Benson | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donald Russell Christian Hepburn | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Peake | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wilcock | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr BRIAN JOHN CLARKE | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MAURICE WIMPORY | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Willars | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.