KHIDMAT WELFARE TRUST KK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING FOOD PACKS IN RURAL AREAS OF PAKISTAN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Pakistan
Governance
- 04 November 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
zakar malook Mr | Chair | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
mujahid Najib M.N | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
mohammed zahid M.Z | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/06/2020 | 05/06/2021 | 05/06/2022 | 05/06/2023 | 05/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.00k | £13.80k | £14.00k | £19.21k | £22.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.15k | £12.50k | £12.50k | £10.00k | £19.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 June 2024 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 June 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 June 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 June 2021 | 16 June 2022 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 June 2020 | 11 June 2021 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 JUN 2019 AS AMENDED ON 06 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, LIVING IN SUCH AREAS OF PAKISTAN AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED OR ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 manor oaks road
45 MANOR OAKS ROAD
sheffield
S2 5QR
- Phone:
- 01142709984
- Email:
- Info@khidmatwelfaretrust.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window