NF2 BIOSOLUTIONS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to support development of next generation treatments for NF2
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 May 2020: Standard registration
- NF2 Biosolutions UK & Europe (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Goddard | Chair | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Grace Gregory | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Priya Sharma | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Whitlock | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Louise Ward | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR GARETH EVANS | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deian Owen | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gilles Atlan | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicole Henwood | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.70k | £103.04k | £64.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £857 | £791 | £105.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 June 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 19 June 2023 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAY 2019 AS AMENDED ON 27 APR 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SEEKING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO A CURE OR PREVENTATIVE TREATMENT FOR NF2 (NEUROFIBROMATOSIS TYPE 2)
Contact information
- Address:
-
1
SPILMAN ST
CARMARTHEN
SA31 1LE
- Phone:
- 07771349518
- Email:
- Deian@nf2biosolutions.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window