Trustees METHERINGHAM SWIMMING POOL
Charity Number: 1185436

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melanie Wright | Chair | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Finney | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Holmes | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Hunter-Leith | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jayne Duncan | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ann Rymer | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Terence Norman Wright | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.