THE FEDERATION OF WALSALL MUSICIANS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the group shall be to provide support for the activities of young musicians at the Music Hub in Walsall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Walsall
Governance
- 16 February 1984: Standard registration
- 09 February 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- FRIENDS OF WALSALL MUSICIANS (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF WALSALL YOUNG MUSICIANS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.29k | £5.73k | £7.37k | £6.40k | £2.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.83k | £4.07k | £18.75k | £3.84k | £1.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 29 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 30 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MARCH 1983 AS AMENDED 19/01/1984, 19/01/1985, 20/01/1987,12/10/1989,11/10/1990, 15/10/1992,13/10/94,18/03/1997 AND 11/10/01.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE MUSICAL ENVIRONMENT AND MAINTAIN, ENCOURAGE AND DEVELOP OPPORTUNITIES FOR CORPORATE MUSIC MAKING BY WALSALL MUSICIANS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window