UNITED KINGDOM FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1186407
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the charity is, for the public benefit, the advancement of the Christian faith, principally in Saxmundham, Suffolk, and the surrounding area. This has been done by holding open meetings on Sunday mornings together with ad-hoc events at other times.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £245
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 November 2019: CIO registration
  • 16 August 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 16 August 2024: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • UK FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £6.28k £520 £80 £245
Total expenditure £4.27k £207 £123 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 03 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 03 May 2024 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 21 July 2021 On Time