ROUTE 61 (INTERNATIONAL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity identifies & equips mentors to help children & adults to navigate life, including Christian spiritual teaching & discipleship, primarily in Kenya. We provide grants to assist organisations working with children in the juvenile justice system & their families, to provide psychosocial & holistic programmes, as well as workshops promoting family, relationships, education & well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kenya
Governance
- 15 May 2020: CIO registration
- ROUTE 61 (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary BROOKES | Trustee | 23 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Sarah Ruth Bennett | Trustee | 04 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeremy Sinclair Goodman | Trustee | 04 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Derek John Oliver | Trustee | 04 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.99k | £16.95k | £23.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.11k | £23.01k | £24.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO BE CARRIED OUT IN KENYA AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE:- 4.1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH; AND 4.2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 Shearwater Road
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Hertfordshire
HP3 0GB
- Phone:
- 07521394517
- Email:
- contact@route61.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window