CYFEILLION YSGOL FELINHELI

Charity Number: 1186024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We work with school staff and governors, parents and pupils and help strengthen community links with the school by arranging an array of events and activities, for example; school discos, summer and winter fayre, arrange volunteer activities like gardening and reading, film evenings, provide volunteer help and fund raise at school events like concerts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £5,868
Total expenditure: £2,348

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Gwynedd

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 October 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elgan Sion Roberts Trustee 17 November 2022
None on record
Llinos Myfanwy Egan-Fretwell Trustee 07 December 2020
None on record
Melanie Wyn Hughes Trustee 09 January 2019
None on record
Siwan Elenid Glyn Trustee 09 January 2019
None on record
Caroline Williams Trustee 09 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £7.49k £9.66k £4.67k £5.87k
Total expenditure £3.38k £8.18k £10.36k £2.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 04 November 2024 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 20 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ysgol Y Felinheli
Y Felinheli
Port Dinorwig
Gwynedd
LL56 4JS
LL56 4JS
Phone:
01248670748
Website:

No information available