Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, HUNMANBY
Charity number: 1186638
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW John SANTON | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Kathryn Cheesbrough | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Rookes | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Loftus CEng MIME | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Hay | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Catherine Andrew | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Margaret Russell | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Copeman | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.