ESSEX COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and development of young people through a variety of activities and competitions including public speaking, stock judging, cookery and sports. 10 clubs across the county organise their own weekly meeting. Emphasis on social, fundraising and travel opportunities too.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 10 September 2019: CIO registration
- 21 April 2021: Funds received from 301449 ESSEX COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Paget Holland | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Harold Philpot | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Freeman | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Guy French | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Miles Leeder | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.65k | £61.95k | £118.74k | £187.97k | £149.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.28k | £52.19k | £156.28k | £92.05k | £128.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.91k | £3.25k | £552 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS,COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS. (2) IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WILL ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES, SELF-RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITBREADS BARN
CHATHAM GREEN
LITTLE WALTHAM
CHELMSFORD
ESSEX
CM3 3LQ
- Phone:
- 01245360442
- Email:
- office@essexyfc.co.uk
- Website:
-
essexyoungfarmers.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window