THE COURTNEY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work to promote social inclusion and prevent and relieve poverty. We offer material support to relieve financial hardship; develop workshops and events to promote skills and learning development; facilitate inclusive social opportunities; and raise awareness of underserved groups and challenges in relation to social exclusion. We currently operate in Luton, Bedfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Luton
Governance
- 03 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melissa Courtney Llewellyn | Chair | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Aweis Ahmed | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Sadiqul Choudhury | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Parker | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Adde | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/09/2020 | 05/09/2021 | 05/09/2022 | 05/09/2023 | 05/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £14.12k | £7.28k | £62.25k | £95.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £8.28k | £9.82k | £59.79k | £94.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £46.53k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 September 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 September 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 September 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 September 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 September 2020 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2020 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). B) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ENGLAND BY PROVIDING: ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
145a High Street
Luton
Bedfordshire
LU4 9LE
- Phone:
- 07311063676
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window