LONDON RETIRED POLICE DOGS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote humane behaviour towards retired police dogs by providing financial assistance to owners of retired police dogs who have charge of animals that are in need of appropriate care and attention by reason of sickness, poor circumstances or welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £54 from 2 government contract(s) and £18,100 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 February 2020: CIO registration
- LRPD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP WELLS | Chair | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kristian LEIGHTON | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma DIGNAM | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.95k | £74.86k | £94.91k | £143.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.19k | £51.39k | £69.30k | £97.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £54 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 May 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 13 May 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Feb 2020 as amended on 18 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
To promote humane behaviour towards retired police dogs and other service dogs by financial assistance to owners of retired police dogs and other service dogs who have charge of animals that are in need of appropriate care and attention by reason of sickness, poor circumstances or welfare
Contact information
- Address:
-
London Retired Police Dogs Trust
30 Hazlewell Road
LONDON
SW15 6LH
- Phone:
- 07900494687
- Email:
- contactus@lrpd.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window