THE NORTH STAFFS SPECIAL ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make provision through the medium of play for children, young people and adults with disabilities and to provide facilities for play and leisure-time occupation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £38,918 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 22 February 1984: Standard registration
- 19 June 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 19 June 2017: Funds transferred to 1169347 OUR SPACE (STAFFS) LTD
- 19 June 2017: Funds transferred to 1151038 APPROACH SUPPORTING YOUR LIFE YOUR WAY
- 19 June 2017: Funds transferred to 1161247 HOME-START NEWCASTLE BOROUGH
- NORTH STAFFS SPECIAL ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £358.87k | £242.32k | £170.41k | £207.20k | £177.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £233.21k | £277.57k | £216.46k | £215.32k | £226.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £38.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 22 February 2016 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 22 February 2016 | 22 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 26 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 27 November 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 NOVEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 19 JANUARY 1984, 28 MAY 1991, 14 MAY 1997, 23 OCTOBER 2001, 16 NOVEMBER 2004 AND 28 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS WITH A DISABILITY INCLUDING LEARNING DISABILITY, PHYSICAL DISABILITY, SENSORY IMPAIRMENT, BEHAVIOURAL AND EMOTIONAL DIFFICULTIES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PLAY AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window