Financial history HAYLING ISLAND LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1185895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £18.70k £43.92k £40.54k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £26.26k £39.64k £42.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A