Accounts and annual returns BORN TO BE BEAUTIFUL

Charity number: 1188397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2023 20 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2023 23 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 October 2022 28 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2022 28 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 October 2021 30 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2021 30 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 October 2020 29 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 29 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window