THE BENNO'S BOOBS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1186190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a charity that supports individuals diagnosed with Triple Negative Breast Cancer and their families.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 August 2023

Total income: £3,880
Total expenditure: £9,773

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 November 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophie Benson Chair 04 August 2019
None on record
Amelia Hawkes Trustee 04 August 2019
None on record
Laura Bennett Trustee 04 August 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/08/2020 05/08/2021 05/08/2022 05/08/2023
Total gross income £9.57k £9.17k £12.81k £3.88k
Total expenditure £2.76k £2.39k £10.49k £9.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 August 2023 01 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 August 2023 01 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 August 2022 26 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 August 2022 28 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 August 2021 29 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 August 2021 29 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 August 2020 15 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 August 2020 02 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
35A RUSKOI ROAD
CANVEY ISLAND
SS8 9QN
Phone:
07581366841
Website:

No information available